Terms of Service
-
House,
56th
(1)
(2)
Legislature
1/13/1959 - 4/29/1960
Democrat
-
House,
54th Legislature
1/11/1955 - 1/8/1957
Democrat
-
House,
53rd Legislature
1/13/1953 - 1/11/1955
Democrat
(1)
George H. Richards, in special election 6/4/1960, sworn 7/29/1960, succeeded Jamie H. Clements, resigned 4/29/1960.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
56th Legislature - Clements resigned 4/28/1960. Succeeded by George H. Richards, Huntsville, on 6/4/1960. Also shows Clements' former legislatures as 53rd-55th, but House Journals show he served only in the 53rd, 54th, and 56th.
Texas Legislative Manual .