Terms of Service
-
House,
57th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
12/18/1961 - 1/8/1963
Republican
(1)
George F. Korkmas, in special election 12/9/1961, took office 12/23/1961, succeeded Peter J. La Valle, resigned 8/20/1961.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 12/18/1961.
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Pete La Valle replaced by George F. Korkmas, 12/9/1961.
Texas Legislative Manual .