Terms of Service
-
House,
46th Legislature
1/10/1939 - 1/14/1941
Democrat
-
House,
45th
(1)
Legislature
7/23/1938 - 1/10/1939
Democrat
(1)
Robert Stoll, in special election 7/23/1938, succeeded Harry N. Graves, resigned 10/28/1937.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.