Terms of Service
-
House,
44th
(2)
Legislature
1/8/1935 - 11/14/1935
Democrat
-
House,
43rd
(1)
Legislature
1/10/1933 - 1/8/1935
Democrat
(1)
Lawyer. Questionnaire on name, postoffice, occupation, association membership, and relationship to persons in state or county government. 10/11/1933, pp. 588-601.
House Journal .
(2)
William W. Bridgers, in special election 3/7/1936, sworn 9/29/1936, succeeded William E. Clayton, resigned after 2nd Called Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.