Terms of Service
-
House,
73rd Legislature
1/12/1993 - 1/10/1995
Democrat
-
House,
72nd Legislature
1/8/1991 - 1/12/1993
Democrat
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Democrat
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Democrat
-
House,
68th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
5/25/1984 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
(1)
Robert A. Earley, in special election 5/19/1984, sworn 5/25/1984, succeeded Leroy J. Wieting, resigned 3/31/1984. First session was 68th 2nd Called Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 5/25/1984.
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Special election 4/28/1984, runoff 5/19/1984.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .