Terms of Service
-
Senate,
32nd
(2)
(3)
(4)
& 31st
(1)
(5)
Legislatures
1/12/1909 - 8/10/1912
Democrat
(1)
Democrat; roster of members of the 31st Legislature with biographical and party information. "Year Book 1909," Number 13, May-June 1910, pp. 408-415.
Bulletin (Texas Department of Agriculture) 1910.
(2)
Resigned from Legislature 8/10/1912, appointed Superintendent of Board of Managers of Institution for Training of Juveniles at Gatesville on 8/9/1912.
Legislative Reference Library Card File .
(3)
Adams resigned 8/10/1912.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
32nd Legislature - Roll Call of holdover Senators, 1/10/1911, p. 1.
Senate Journal .
(5)
31st Legislature - Roll Call of Senators-elect, oath of office administered, 1/12/1909, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .