Terms of Service
-
House,
70th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/13/1987 - 8/11/1988
Democrat
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Democrat
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
-
House,
67th Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
-
House,
66th
(4)
(5)
Legislature
12/3/1980 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
(1)
"Big Spring lawmaker quitting Texas House," 8/13/1988. "Shaw notified the speaker's office Thursday (8/11/1988) of his change in residency. By moving from his House district - which stretches from Big Spring almost to El Paso - Shaw technically has vacated his seat."
Austin American-Statesman .
(2)
Troy Fraser, in special election 11/8/1988, sworn 11/15/1988, succeeded Larry D. Shaw, moved from district 8/12/1988.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-1992 1992.
(3)
Troy Fraser, in special election 11/8/1988, sworn 11/15/1988, succeeded Larry D. Shaw, moved from district 8/11/1988.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
Larry D. Shaw, in special election 11/22/1980, sworn 12/3/1980, succeeded Michael H. Ezzell, resigned 10/15/1980. First session was 67th Regular.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(5)
Certificate of election for special election 11/22/1980.
Texas Secretary of State .