Full Name: Roy Morris Blake, Sr.
Birth date: March 29, 1928
Death date: March 4, 2017
Terms of Service
-
Senate,
70th & 69th Legislatures
1/8/1985 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
Senate President Pro Tempore, Ad Interim R.S., elected 6/1/1987; 1st C.S., elected 6/2/1987; Ad Interim 1st C.S., elected 6/3/1987; 2nd C.S., elected 6/22/1987; and Ad Interim 2nd C.S., elected 7/21/1987.
-
Senate,
68th
(3)
Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
-
Senate,
67th & 66th Legislatures
1/9/1979 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
-
Senate,
65th
(1)
(2)
(4)
(5)
Legislature
2/28/1978 - 1/9/1979
Democrat
-
House,
65th
(1)
(2)
(4)
(5)
Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/10/1978
Democrat
-
House,
64th Legislature
1/14/1975 - 1/11/1977
Democrat
-
House,
63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Democrat
(1)
Proclamation, 12/15/1977, ordering a special election in House District 4 on 2/18/1978 to serve out the unexpired term of the Honorable Roy Blake.
Governor Dolph Briscoe .
(2)
In Senate, Roy M. Blake, in special election 2/18/1978, took office 2/28/1978, succeeded Don G. Adams, resigned 12/31/1977. In House, James W. Haley, sworn 3/1/1978, succeeded Roy M. Blake, resigned 1/10/1978. (Haley's first session was 65th 2nd C.S.)
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
68th Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 3/17/1983, p. 495. Drew 2-year term (also see message from President, p. 467).
Senate Journal .
(4)
Roy Blake House resignation letter, 11/17/1977 - states House resignation effective 1/10/1978.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office .
(5)
Haley elected State Representative District 4 in special election 2/18/1978.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .