Terms of Service
-
House,
69th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/8/1985 - 11/14/1986
Democrat
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
-
House,
67th Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
-
House,
66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
(1)
69th Legislature, 2nd Called Session, Statement by Mr. Bill Messer, 8/11/1986, p. 24. Messer did not attend 2nd and 3rd Called Sessions.
House Journal .
(2)
Hugh Shine, elected both for the remainder of Messer's term and to a new term on 11/4/1986, sworn 11/14/1986, succeeded William A. Messer, who, to avoid appearance of conflict of interest, did not attend 2nd Called Session and 3rd Called Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
69th Legislature - Messer resigned as of 11/14/1986.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Biographies of Legislators 1947.