Terms of Service
-
House,
88th Legislature
1/10/2023 - 1/14/2025
Democrat
-
House,
67th
(5)
Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/3/1983
Democrat
-
House,
66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
-
House,
65th Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/9/1979
Democrat
-
House,
64th Legislature
1/14/1975 - 1/11/1977
Democrat
-
House,
63rd
(1)
(2)
(3)
(4)
(6)
Legislature
1/29/1974 - 1/14/1975
Democrat
(1)
John W. Bryant, in special election 1/26/1974, sworn in Constitutional Convention of 1974 on 1/29/1974, succeeded Joseph P. Hawn, died 11/22/1973. First session was 64th Regular.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 1/29/1974.
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Bryant oath of office as delegate, 1/31/1974, p. 220.
Record of Proceedings, Texas Constitutional Convention: Official Journals, January 8 - July 30, 1974 1975.
(4)
Bryant oath of office as delegate, 1/31/1974, p. 118.
Record of Proceedings, Texas Constitutional Convention: Official Proceedings, January 8 - July 30, 1974 1975.
(5)
Resigned 1/3/1983. Resignation and special elections information, 67th Legislature.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office .
(6)
64th-67th Legislatures - Bryant oath of office date for House of Representatives, 1/29/1974.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Seniority Order .