James Ryland Eanes
Full Name: James Ryland EanesDate of birth: October 26, 1872
Date of death: November 3, 1953
Terms of Service top
Chamber | District | Dates of Service | Legislatures | Party | City/County | Note | Counties in District |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
H | 104 | Elected but never sworn | 51st (1) (2) (3) | Democrat | Comanche / Comanche | Comanche, Mills |
(1) 51st Legislature - Eanes elected, but never sworn. Resigned for health reasons without qualifying 1/13/1949. W.E. Heatly, Representative for the 104th district in the 50th Legislature retained seat until election of successor, p. 73. House Journal.
(2) William E. Heatly, incumbent of 50th Leg., was held over and was sworn and seated 1/26/1949, when J.R. Eanes resigned 1/13/1949, before being sworn in. Arthur E. Gromatzky, in special election 2/10/1949, succeeded Heatly and was sworn 2/15/1949. Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004, 2005.
(3) Eanes not listed as a member of the 51st Legislature. Texas Legislative Manual.
Terms of Service top
House District 104
Elected but never sworn Legislatures: 51st (1) (2) (3) Party: Democrat Home City/County: Comanche / Comanche Counties in district: Comanche, Mills |
(1) 51st Legislature - Eanes elected, but never sworn. Resigned for health reasons without qualifying 1/13/1949. W.E. Heatly, Representative for the 104th district in the 50th Legislature retained seat until election of successor, p. 73. House Journal.
(2) William E. Heatly, incumbent of 50th Leg., was held over and was sworn and seated 1/26/1949, when J.R. Eanes resigned 1/13/1949, before being sworn in. Arthur E. Gromatzky, in special election 2/10/1949, succeeded Heatly and was sworn 2/15/1949. Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004, 2005.
(3) Eanes not listed as a member of the 51st Legislature. Texas Legislative Manual.
Biographical Information top
Resolutions and Journal entries
- 51st Legislature, R.S., HSR 18, 1/20/1949, extending sympathy of the House to J.R. Eanes, acknowledging his resignation, and wishing him a complete recovery. Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary.
Biographical Sketches
- Obituary and photo, "J.R. Eanes Former Mayor, Postmaster and Called by Some Comanche's No. 1 Citizen, Dies After 5 Years Illness," The Comanche Chief, 11/6/1953, pp. 1, 10, crediting Comanche Public Library. James Ryland Eanes, born 10/26/1872 in Fayette County; "in 1948 when the voters of Comanche and Mills Counties nominated and elected him as a member of the Texas Legislature . . . Mr. Eanes was not able to go to Austin when the Legislature convened in January 1949 and soon afterwards graciously resigned his position." Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries).
Other Resources
- James Ryland Eanes, birth date 10/26/1872 in Fayette County, death date 11/3/1953 in Comanche, Comanche County, real estate dealer. FamilySearch Texas Deaths, 1890-1976.
- J.R. Eanes (1872-1853), burial in Oakwood Cemetery, Comanche, Comanche County. Find a Grave.
- LAKE EANES, TEXAS. Named for J.R. Eanes, mayor of Comanche. Handbook of Texas Online.
Composite Photographs on Display in the Capitol
- 51st session composite photo of House members (Ground floor corridor, south wall. GW.C1). State Preservation Board.
Committee Information top
This website is a work in progress. Information on this website is provided as a public service by the Legislative Reference Library. The Legislative Reference Library makes no representation as to its completeness or accuracy and makes no warranty in regard to its use. Users assume all risk of reliance on the information included on this site.
Party information is not available for the 1st-11th Legislatures.
Have a question, comment or contribution? Email the Library or call 512-463-1252.
Many photos in Texas Legislators: Past and Present are used with permission of the Texas State Preservation Board. For permission to reproduce these photos, please contact the Texas State Preservation Board graphics coordinator at 512-475-3060.