Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Charles Ervin Hughes
Full Name: Charles Ervin Hughes
Birth date: April 30, 1927
Death date: August 11, 1978
Terms of Service
House, 57th Legislature
1/10/1961 - 1/8/1963
Democrat
House, 56th Legislature
1/13/1959 - 1/10/1961
Democrat
House, 55th Legislature
1/8/1957 - 1/13/1959
Democrat
House, 54th Legislature
1/11/1955 - 1/8/1957
Democrat
House, 53rd Legislature
1/13/1953 - 1/11/1955
Democrat
House, 52nd Legislature
1/9/1951 - 1/13/1953
Democrat
Biographical Notes and Resources
Resolutions and Journal entries
53rd Legislature, R.S., HSR 264.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
54th Legislature, R.S., HSR 99.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
57th Legislature, R.S., HSR 592.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
66th Legislature, R.S., HCR 25.
Resolutions - Memorial
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
Texas Yearbook, 56th Legislature
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles E. Hughes,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Memorial, December 1978, p. 1125.
Texas Bar Journal
.
Merchant Marines. Memorial, December 1978, p. 1125.
Texas Bar Journal
.
Committee Information
57th R.S. - 1961
Congressional and Legislative Districts
(Vice Chair)
Insurance Investigating (State Board of Insurance, Rate Increase), Special
(Chair)
Judiciary
Municipal and Private Corporations
Oil, Gas and Mining
Public Lands and Buildings
(Chair)
56th R.S. - 1959
Congressional and Legislative Districts
(Chair)
Insurance
Local Water Districts
Military and Veteran's Affairs
Municipal and Private Corporations
(Vice Chair)
State Hospitals and Special Schools
(Vice Chair)
55th R.S. - 1957
Claims and Accounts
(Vice Chair)
Congressional and Legislative Districts
Examination of Comptroller's and Treasurer's Accounts
Municipal and Private Corporations
Privileges, Suffrage and Elections
54th R.S. - 1955
Aeronautics
Commerce and Manufactures
(Vice Chair)
Livestock and Stock Raising
Municipal and Private Corporations
Public Lands and Buildings
53rd R.S. - 1953
Counties
Municipal and Private Corporations
Privileges, Suffrage and Elections
Representation Before the Legislature
State Hospitals and Special Schools
52nd R.S. - 1951
Banks and Banking
Claims and Accounts
Criminal Jurisprudence
Municipal and Private Corporations
State Hospitals and Special Schools
LRL Home
|
View full site