Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Robert Lee Proffer
Full Name: Robert Lee "Bob" Proffer
Birth date: April 14, 1909
Death date: April 3, 1986
Terms of Service
Senate, 51st & 50th Legislatures
1/14/1947 - 1/9/1951
Democrat
House, 49th Legislature
1/9/1945 - 1/14/1947
Democrat
House, 48th Legislature
1/12/1943 - 1/9/1945
Democrat
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
55th Legislature, 2nd C.S., SR 22.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Photographs
Photograph.
R.L. Proffer,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
R.L. "Bob" Proffer,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
R.L. Bob Proffer,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
R.L. Bob Proffer,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Obituary index lists birth date as 4/14/1909 and death date as 4/3/1986.
Denton Record-Chronicle
.
Obituary, 4/6/1986, p. 2A.
Denton Record-Chronicle
.
PROFFER, ROBERT LEE (1909-1986).
Handbook of Texas Online
.
Committee Information
51st R.S. - 1949
Agriculture
Congressional Districts
Education
(Chair)
Federal Relations
(Vice Chair)
Finance
Game and Fish
Nominations of the Governor
Poet Laureate Selection, Special
Public Health
(Vice Chair)
Representative Districts
Senatorial Districts
State Affairs
Water Rights, Irrigation and Drainage
50th R.S. - 1947
Aeronautics
Agriculture
Congressional Districts
(Chair)
Constitutional Amendments
Education
(Vice Chair)
Enrolled Bills
Finance
Nominations of Governor
Public Health
Representative Districts
Rural Aid Equalization, Special Joint Legislative
Senatorial Districts
49th R.S. - 1945
Agriculture
Appropriations
Conservation and Reclamation
Education
(Vice Chair)
Rules
School Aid Appropriation, Special
School Districts
(Chair)
48th R.S. - 1943
Agriculture
Appropriations
Education
Examination of Comptroller's and Treasurer's Accounts
Interstate Cooperation
School Census, Special
LRL Home
|
View full site