Terms of Service
-
Senate,
49th
(1)
Legislature
1/9/1945 - 5/29/1946
Democrat
-
Senate,
48th & 47th Legislatures
1/14/1941 - 1/9/1945
Democrat
-
Senate,
46th
(3)
& 45th
(2)
Legislatures
1/12/1937 - 1/14/1941
Democrat
-
House,
44th Legislature
1/8/1935 - 1/12/1937
Democrat
(1)
Walter Tynan, in special election 7/27/1946, succeeded J. Franklin Spears, died 5/29/1946.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
45th Legislature - Oath of Office Administered to Senators-Elect, 1/12/1937, p. 2.
Senate Journal .
(3)
46th Legislature - Roll Call of Senators, holdover Senators "who were Members of the Forty-fifth Legislature and whose terms of office continue for the duration of the Forty-sixth Legislature," 1/10/1939, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .