Terms of Service
-
House,
46th
(1)
Legislature
1/10/1939 - 3/18/1939
Democrat
-
House,
44th Legislature
1/8/1935 - 1/12/1937
Democrat
-
House,
42nd Legislature
1/13/1931 - 1/10/1933
Democrat
-
House,
41st Legislature
1/8/1929 - 1/13/1931
Democrat
-
House,
40th Legislature
1/11/1927 - 1/8/1929
Democrat
(1)
Paul C. Boethel, in special election 4/10/1939, sworn 4/12/1939, succeeded J.J. Olsen, died 3/18/1939.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.