Terms of Service
-
Senate,
44th
(5)
& 43rd
(4)
Legislatures
1/10/1933 - 1/12/1937
Democrat
Senate President Pro Tempore, 2nd C.S., elected 10/16/1935.
-
Senate,
42nd
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/13/1931 - 1/10/1933
Democrat
-
House,
40th Legislature
1/11/1927 - 1/8/1929
Democrat
-
House,
39th Legislature
1/13/1925 - 1/11/1927
Democrat
(1)
William R. Poage, in special election 11/4/1930, sworn in 42nd Legislature, succeeded to the unexpired term of Edgar E. Witt, resigned after 5th C.S.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
"Heavy Vote Seen on Amendments...Texas Contests One-sided Except Wurzbach-Dielmann in 14th," Tuesday morning 11/4/1930, p. 4. "Three Democrats were running for the post vacated by Senator Edgar E. Witt of Waco...They were Former Representative W. R. Poage of Waco..."
San Antonio Express .
(3)
42nd Legislature - Roll Call of Newly-Elected Senators, oath of office administered, 1/13/1931, p. 1.
Senate Journal .
(4)
43rd Legislature - Roll Call of New Senators and Certificate of New Senators, oath of office administered, 1/10/1933, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(5)
44th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators, 1/8/1935, p. 1.
Senate Journal .