Terms of Service
-
House,
79th
(2)
(6)
Legislature
1/11/2005 - 7/31/2006
Democrat
-
House,
78th Legislature
1/14/2003 - 1/11/2005
Democrat
-
House,
77th Legislature
1/9/2001 - 1/14/2003
Democrat
-
House,
76th Legislature
1/12/1999 - 1/9/2001
Democrat
-
House,
75th Legislature
1/14/1997 - 1/12/1999
Democrat
-
House,
74th Legislature
1/10/1995 - 1/14/1997
Democrat
-
House,
73rd
(1)
(3)
(4)
(5)
(7)
(8)
Legislature
5/4/1993 - 1/10/1995
Democrat
(1)
Texas Employment Commission appointment letters, 2/10/1993 and 2/18/1993.
Governor Ann W. Richards .
(2)
Proclamation, 8/29/2006, Ordering special election in House District 33 on 11/7/2006 to serve unexpired term of Vilma Luna.
Governor Rick Perry .
(3)
73rd Legislature - Roll of Members-Elect, 1/12/1993, p. 4.
House Journal .
(4)
Vilma Luna, in special election 5/1/1993, sworn 5/4/1993, succeeded to unexpired term of Eddie Cavazos, did not take oath of office.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(5)
73rd Legislature - V. Luna oath of office date.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Seniority Order .
(6)
Solomon Ortiz in special election 11/7/2006, sworn 11/25/2006, succeeded unexpired term of Vilma Luna, resigned effective 7/31/2006.
Texas Secretary of State - Historical Election Returns, 1992-2019 .
(7)
State Representative, District 33, April 3, 1993 and May 1, 1993.
Texas Secretary of State - Statement of Canvass for Special Election 1992.
(8)
1992 General Election, State Representative District 33.
Texas Secretary of State - Texas Official General Election Returns [Including Primary] 1936.