Terms of Service
-
Senate,
40th
(11)
& 39th
(4)
(10)
Legislatures
1/13/1925 - 1/8/1929
Democrat
Dean of the Senate.
Dean of the Senate.
-
Senate,
38th
(1)
(9)
Legislature
1/9/1923 - 1/13/1925
Democrat
-
Senate,
37th
(8)
& 36th
(7)
Legislatures
1/14/1919 - 1/9/1923
Democrat
Senate President Pro Tempore, elected 7/18/1921, 1st C.S.
-
Senate,
35th
(6)
& 34th
(5)
Legislatures
1/12/1915 - 1/14/1919
Democrat
Senate President Pro Tempore, elected in the absence of the President and President Pro Tem 4/27/1917, 1st C.S.
-
Senate,
33rd
(2)
(3)
Legislature
8/11/1913 - 1/12/1915
Democrat
-
House,
26th Legislature
1/10/1899 - 1/8/1901
Democrat
-
House,
25th Legislature
1/12/1897 - 1/10/1899
Democrat
-
House,
24th Legislature
1/8/1895 - 1/12/1897
Democrat
(1)
2-year term; entire Senate went up for reelection in 1924 due to redistricting. Act approved 1921 and effective Apr. 1, 1924, 37th Leg., 1st C.S., ch. 60,
Apportionment Laws of Texas, 1836-1950 1950.
(2)
Democrat - "Announcements: For State Senator," 7/30/1913, p. 2. John H. Bailey, of Cuero, is a candidate for state senator at election to be held Tuesday, 8/5/1913, "subject to the Democratic primaries, if any are held."
Daily Advocate (Victoria, Texas) .
(3)
John H. Bailey, in special election 8/5/1913, sworn 8/11/1913, succeeded William O. Murray, resigned 7/15/1913.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
39th Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 1/15/1925, pp. 34-35. Drew 4-year term.
Senate Journal .
(5)
34th Legislature - Elected November 3, 1914, oath of office administered to members elect, 1/12/1915, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(6)
35th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators, 1/9/1917, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(7)
36th Legislature - Member-elect in List of State Senators Elected at the General Election Held November 5th, 1918, oath of office administered, 1/14/1919, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(8)
37th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators/Absent, 1/11/1921, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(9)
38th Legislature - List of State Senators Elected at the General Election Held November Seventh, 1922, oath of office administered, 1/9/1923, p. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(10)
39th Legislature - All 31 Senators were elected on November 4, 1924, per Secretary of State, oath of office administered, 1/13/1925, p. 1.
Senate Journal .
(11)
40th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators, 1/11/1927, p. 1.
Senate Journal .