Terms of Service
-
House,
41st Legislature
1/8/1929 - 1/13/1931
Democrat
-
House,
31st
(1)
(2)
Legislature
1/12/1909 - 3/9/1910
Democrat
-
House,
30th Legislature
1/8/1907 - 1/12/1909
Democrat
(1)
Democrat; Jenkins "resigned to accept appointment February 18, 1910, as Associate Justice of the court of Civil Appeals of the 3rd Supreme Judicial District of Texas. Assumed his duties on the bench in March, 1910." Roster of members of the 31st Legislature with biographical and party information. "Year Book 1909," Number 13, May-June 1910, p. 413.
Bulletin (Texas Department of Agriculture) 1910.
(2)
E.A. McDaniel, sworn 7/29/1910, succeeded Charles H. Jenkins, resigned 3/9/1910.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.