Terms of Service
-
House,
41st Legislature
1/8/1929 - 1/13/1931
Democrat
-
House,
37th Legislature
1/11/1921 - 1/9/1923
Democrat
-
House,
36th
(1)
(2)
(3)
(4)
Legislature
5/27/1920 - 1/11/1921
Democrat
(1)
36th Legislature, 3rd C.S. - Oath of Office Administered (to J. Lewis Thompson, Loyd J. Smith, and G.T. Bludworth), 5/27/1920, p. 49. No committee appointments listed for Thompson or Smith in 3rd-4th C.S.; Bludworth appointed to Education 5/27/1920.
House Journal .
(2)
"Davidson Winner in Senatorial Race," 3/11/1920, p. 11. "Captain C.C. Beavens, E.W. Neal and J. Lewis Thompson were all easily the successful candidates for representative from the Fifteenth Representative District. In the representative race all of the non-partisan [league] candidates were defeated."
Lockhart Post-Register .
(3)
In Senate, Lynch Davidson, in special election 3/4/1920, sworn 5/20/1920, succeeded Rienzi M. Johnston, resigned 1/12/1920. In House, J. Lewis Thompson, sworn 5/27/1920, succeeded Lynch Davidson, resigned 1/16/1920.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
Assumed Democrat based on listing as a Democrat in the 37th Legislature.
Texas Legislative Manual .