Terms of Service
-
Senate,
40th
(8)
& 39th
(3)
(7)
Legislatures
1/13/1925 - 1/8/1929
Republican
-
Senate,
33rd
(4)
& 32nd
(5)
Legislatures
1/10/1911 - 1/12/1915
Republican
-
Senate,
31st
(1)
(2)
(6)
(9)
Legislature
1/12/1909 - 1/10/1911
Republican
(1)
Democrat; roster of members of the 31st Legislature with biographical and party information. "Year Book 1909," Number 13, May-June 1910, pp. 408-415.
Bulletin (Texas Department of Agriculture) 1910.
(2)
Julius Real, in special election 11/3/1908, succeeded Robert B. Green, died 12/1/1907.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
39th Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 1/15/1925, pp. 34-35. Drew 4-year term.
Senate Journal .
(4)
33rd Legislature - Roll Call, holdover Senators elected on 11/8/1910 for a full period of four years, 1/14/1913, pp. 1-3.
Senate Journal .
(5)
32nd Legislature - Roll Call of Senators-elect, oath of office administered, 1/10/1911, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(6)
31st Legislature - Roll Call of Senators-elect, oath of office administered, 1/12/1909, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(7)
39th Legislature - All 31 Senators were elected on November 4, 1924, per Secretary of State, oath of office administered, 1/13/1925, p. 1.
Senate Journal .
(8)
40th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators, 1/11/1927, p. 1.
Senate Journal .
(9)
31st-33rd, 39th-40th Legislature - Republican.
Texas Legislative Manual .