Terms of Service
-
House,
39th
(1)
Legislature
1/13/1925 - 8/20/1925
Democrat
-
House,
38th Legislature
1/9/1923 - 1/13/1925
Democrat
-
House,
37th Legislature
1/11/1921 - 1/9/1923
Democrat
(1)
J.C. Hall, in special election 1/2/1926, sworn 9/13/1926, succeeded Richard M. Chitwood, resigned 8/20/1925.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.