Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Richard Ernest Seagler
Full Name: Richard Ernest Seagler
Birth date: December 3, 1883
Death date: January 6, 1956
Terms of Service
House, 38th
(1)
Legislature
1/9/1923 - 4/5/1924
Democrat
Speaker
House, 37th Legislature
1/11/1921 - 1/9/1923
Democrat
House, 36th Legislature
1/14/1919 - 1/11/1921
Democrat
(1) Seagler resigned 4/5/1924.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004
2005.
Biographical Notes and Resources
Photographs
Photograph.
Richard Ernest Seagler,
Presiding Officers of the Texas Legislature, 1846-2006
Photograph.
R.E. Seagler,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
R.E. Seagler,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
R.E. Seagler,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
SEAGLER, RICHARD ERNEST (1883-1956).
Handbook of Texas Online
.
48th Speaker of the House of Representatives: Richard Ernest Seagler. Photo and biographical sketch.
Presiding Officers of the Texas Legislature, 1846-2016
2016.
Memorial, May 1956, p. 307.
Texas Bar Journal
.
Committee Information
37th R.S. - 1921
Congressional Districts
Criminal Jurisprudence
(Chair)
Judiciary
Penitentiaries
Penitentiary Investigating
Privileges, Suffrage and Elections
Rules
(Vice Chair)
Site for State Park
36th R.S. - 1919
Common Carriers
Federal Relations
Judiciary
Revenue and Taxation
LRL Home
|
View full site