Full Name: Cyrus Fleetwood Richards, Sr.
Birth date: January 1, 1889
Death date: July 22, 1963
Terms of Service
-
Senate,
37th
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/11/1921 - 12/7/1922
Democrat
-
House,
36th Legislature
1/14/1919 - 1/11/1921
Democrat
-
House,
35th
(1)
Legislature
1/9/1917 - 1/14/1919
Democrat
(1)
Resolution granting leaves of absence to members who enlisted for military service, pp. 155-156.
House Journal .
(2)
Alvin J. Wirtz, in special election 1/10/1923, sworn in 38th Legislature, succeeded Cyrus F. Richards, resigned 12/7/1922.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
37th Legislature - List of State Senators Elected at the General Election Held November 2nd, 1920, oath of office administered, 1/11/1921, pp. 2-3.
Senate Journal .