Terms of Service
-
Senate,
85th
(1)
(10)
(11)
Legislature
1/10/2017 - 6/21/2018
Democrat
-
Senate,
84th & 83rd
(6)
Legislatures
1/8/2013 - 1/10/2017
Democrat
-
Senate,
82nd
(7)
Legislature
1/11/2011 - 1/8/2013
Democrat
-
Senate,
81st & 80th Legislatures
1/9/2007 - 1/11/2011
Democrat
-
Senate,
79th
(2)
(4)
(9)
Legislature
11/27/2006 - 1/9/2007
Democrat
-
House,
79th
(2)
(4)
(9)
Legislature
1/11/2005 - 11/27/2006
Democrat
-
House,
78th Legislature
1/14/2003 - 1/11/2005
Democrat
-
House,
77th Legislature
1/9/2001 - 1/13/2003
Democrat
-
House,
76th Legislature
1/12/1999 - 1/9/2001
Democrat
-
House,
75th
(3)
(5)
(8)
Legislature
6/25/1997 - 1/12/1999
Democrat
(1)
Proclamations, 6/20/2018 and 8/11/2018, ordering special election on 7/31/2018 and runoff election on 9/18/2018 in Senate District 19 to serve out unexpired term of Carlos Uresti.
Governor Greg Abbott .
(2)
Proclamation, 8/29/2006, ordering special election in Senate District 19 on 11/7/2006 to serve unexpired term of Frank Madla.
Governor Rick Perry .
(3)
Carlos Uresti, in special election 6/21/1997, sworn 6/25/1997, succeeded Ciro D. Rodriguez, resigned 4/17/1997.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
Sworn into Texas Senate 11/27/2006.
Oaths of Office .
(5)
Oath of office, statement of elected officer. Sworn into Texas House of Representatives 6/25/1997.
Oaths of Office .
(6)
83rd Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 1/23/2013, SR 36, pp. 81-82. Drew 4-year term.
Senate Journal .
(7)
2-year term; entire Senate went up for reelection in 2012 due to redistricting.
Texas Constitution Art. III, ยง3, Election and term of office of Senators .
(8)
75th Legislature - Uresti oath of office date 6/25/1997.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Seniority Order .
(9)
Carlos Uresti, in special election 11/7/2006, sworn 11/27/2006, succeeded unexpired term of Frank Madla, resigned 5/31/2006.
Texas Secretary of State - Historical Election Returns, 1992-2019 .
(10)
Pete Flores, in special election 7/31/2018, runoff 9/18/2018, sworn 10/12/2018, succeeded unexpired term of Carlos Uresti, resigned 6/21/2018.
Texas Secretary of State - Historical Election Returns, 1992-2019 .
(11)
Resignation Statement of Senator Carlos Uresti After 22 Years of Service, 6/18/2018. Resignation effective 6/21/2018.
Texas Senate .