Terms of Service
-
Senate,
36th
(1)
Legislature
3/7/1919 - 1/11/1921
Democrat
(1)
E.L. Rector, in special election 2/20/1919, sworn 3/7/1919, succeeded W. Scott Woodward, resigned 1/31/1919.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.