Terms of Service
-
Senate,
36th
(1)
(3)
& 35th
(2)
Legislatures
1/9/1917 - 1/31/1919
Democrat
(1)
E.L. Rector, in special election 2/20/1919, sworn 3/7/1919, succeeded W. Scott Woodward, resigned 1/31/1919.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
35th Legislature - Member-elect in List of State Senators Elected at the General Election Held November 7, 1916, oath of office administered, 1/9/1917, pp. 2-3.
Senate Journal .
(3)
36th Legislature - Roll Call of Holdover Senators/Absent, 1/14/1919, p. 1.
Senate Journal .