Terms of Service
-
Senate,
34th
(2)
& 33rd
(3)
Legislatures
1/14/1913 - 1/9/1917
Democrat
-
Senate,
32nd
(1)
(4)
Legislature
1/10/1911 - 1/14/1913
Democrat
(1)
J.R. Astin, in special election 11/8/1910, succeeded Alfred J. Harper, resigned 9/21/1910.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
34th Legislature - Roll Call of holdover Senators, 1/12/1915, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(3)
33rd Legislature - List of Senators elected on November 5, 1912, oath of office administered, 1/14/1913, pp. 3-4.
Senate Journal .
(4)
32nd Legislature - Roll Call of Senators-elect, oath of office administered, 1/10/1911, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .