Terms of Service
-
Senate,
33rd
(1)
(2)
(4)
& 32nd
(3)
Legislatures
1/14/1911 - 4/1/1913
Democrat
(1)
Absolom C. Oliver, in special election 7/19/1913, sworn 8/13/1913, succeeded Horace W. Vaughan, resigned 4/1/1913. John M. Henderson, sworn 9/11/1914, succeeded Absolom C. Oliver, resigned 8/21/1913.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
33rd Legislature - Roll Call, holdover Senators elected on 11/8/1910 for a full period of four years, 1/14/1913, pp. 1-3.
Senate Journal .
(3)
32nd Legislature - Roll Call of Senators-elect, oath of office administered, 1/10/1911, pp. 1-2.
Senate Journal .
(4)
Resignation letter to President of the Senate from Senator Horace W. Vaughan, 2/3/1913, effective 3/3/1913; Message from Governor Colquitt, 3/3/1913 and Vaughan's letters of resignation to Governor, 2/13/1913, and withdrawing tender of resignation, 3/2/1913; personal privilege remarks, 3/5/1913; Vaughan resignation letter dated 4/1/1913, effective immediately after adjournment on 4/1/1913, pp. 260, 719-720, 794-795, 1538.
Senate Journal .