Terms of Service
-
House,
31st
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/12/1909 - 11/5/1909
Democrat
(1)
Democrat, resigned 11/25/1909; roster of members of the 31st Legislature with biographical and party information. "Year Book 1909," Number 13, May-June 1910, pp. 408-415.
Bulletin (Texas Department of Agriculture) 1910.
(2)
R.B. Humphrey, sworn 7/26/1910, succeeded D.J. Brookreson, resigned 11/5/1909.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
"Hon. D.J. Brookreson of Knox Co. has tendered to the governor his resignation as a legislator from the 104th representative district, to become effective at once." "Capital City Letter, Austin, Tex., Nov. 29, 1909,"
Albany News, 12/3/1909, p. 3, crediting The Old Jail Art Center.
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .