Terms of Service
-
House,
72nd
(1)
(2)
(3)
(4)
(5)
Legislature
1/8/1991 - 1/9/1991
Republican
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Republican
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Republican
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Republican
(1)
"Connelly to Resign House Seat a Day After Swearing-in," 12/15/1990. "Connelly, R-Houston, announced Friday he will quit his House seat Jan. 9, the day after he is sworn in for a fifth term."
Houston Post .
(2)
Peggy Hamric, in special election 3/9/1991, sworn 3/14/1991, succeeded D. Barry Connelly, resigned 3/13/1991.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-1992 1992.
(3)
Peggy Hamric, in special election 3/9/1991, sworn 3/14/1991, succeeded D. Barry Connelly, resigned 1/9/1991, but continued to serve until successor sworn. Hamric sworn during 72nd Regular Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
72nd Legislature - Connelly resigned 1/9/1991.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office - Biographical Data, House of Representatives .
(5)
Special election 2/9/1991, runoff 3/9/1991.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .