Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Bill Hammond
Full Name: William O. "Bill" Hammond
Terms of Service
House, 71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
House, 70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Republican
House, 69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Republican
House, 68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Republican
Biographical Notes and Resources
Resolutions and Journal entries
68th Legislature, R.S., HR 568.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Bill Hammond,
Members of the 71st Legislature Texas House of Representatives (CD-RW)
Photograph.
Bill Hammond,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bill Hammond,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bill Hammond,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bill Hammond,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Hammond, William O.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Committee Information
71st R.S. - 1989
Elections
(Chair)
Elections Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Public Education
Public Education Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
70th R.S. - 1987
Local and Consent Calendars
(Chair)
Natural Resources
Public Education
Public Education Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
69th R.S. - 1985
Capital Formation, Select, Interim
Financial Institutions
(Vice Chair)
Financial Institutions Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Public Education
68th R.S. - 1983
Financial Institutions
Financial Institutions Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Public Education
Public Education Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
LRL Home
|
View full site