Terms of Service
-
House,
72nd
(1)
(2)
Legislature
1/8/1991 - 5/21/1991
Republican
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Republican
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Republican
(1)
Brian McCall, in special election 7/13/1991, sworn 7/19/1991, succeeded Samuel Johnson, resigned 5/21/1991. McCall's first session was 72nd 1st Called Session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
U.S. Representative District 3 special election 5/4/1991, runoff 5/18/1991. Johnson elected to Congress 5/18/1991 to fill unexpired term of Steve Bartlett, who resigned.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .