Terms of Service
-
Senate,
23rd
(1)
(2)
(3)
(4)
(5)
Legislature
1/10/1893 - 9/10/1894
Democrat
(1)
"The democratic executive committee...recommended Judge Sherrill of Hunt as such successor of Charles Yoakum, lately resigned," 9/23/1894, p. 4.
Galveston Daily News .
(2)
"The New Commission...Republicans at Austin: Argument to secure the nomination of Yoakum...", 8/25/1894, p. 4. "Yoakum stated to a News reporter this afternoon that he would resign his seat as representative of the Fifth senatorial district..."
Galveston Daily News .
(3)
"To fill a vacancy," 9/11/1894, p. 6 (dateline Sept. 10). "The resignation of C.H. Yoakum, state senator from the Fifth district, has been received by Governor Hogg..."
Galveston Daily News .
(4)
Yoakum resigned after session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(5)
23rd Legislature - All 31 Senators are listed in Roll Call on First Day, 1/10/1893, p. 1; resolution by Sen. Cranford that the Senators shall now be divided by lot into two classes, 1/11/1893, p. 5; drew term of 4 years.
Senate Journal .
January 10, 1893
January 11, 1893