Terms of Service
(1)
Democrat.
Biennial Report of the Secretary of State of the State of Texas: List of Senators and Representatives .
(2)
Democrat.
Biennial Report of the Secretary of State of the State of Texas: List of Senators and Representatives .
(3)
William W. Searcy, sworn 3/14/1892, succeeded Ernst G. Maetze, died 10/12/1891.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
J. Maetz, Senate District 12. List of Senators of the 21st Legislature, "The State Senate: Members-Elect in the Different Districts - Austin Local Notes,"
Galveston Daily News, 11/20/1888, p. 6, crediting Abilene Library Consortium. "There are two independents in the list. The rest are democratic nominees."
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .
(5)
21st Legislature - Roll call of new members, oath of office administered, 1/8/1889, p. 1.
Senate Journal .