Terms of Service
-
House,
71st
(1)
(2)
Legislature
1/10/1989 - 2/2/1989
Democrat
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Democrat
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
(1)
Ken VanderVoort, in special election 3/21/1989, sworn 3/28/1989, succeeded David M. Patronella, resigned 2/2/1989.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Special election 3/7/1989, runoff 3/21/1989.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .