Terms of Service
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Democrat
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Democrat
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
-
House,
67th Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
-
House,
66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
-
House,
65th Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/9/1979
Democrat
-
House,
64th
(1)
Legislature
1/23/1975 - 1/11/1977
Democrat
(1)
In Senate, Lindon Williams, in special election 1/11/1975, sworn 1/14/1975, succeeded James P. Wallace, resigned 12/20/1974. In House, Anthony Polumbo, in special election 1/21/1975, sworn 1/23/1975, succeeded Lindon Williams, resigned 12/20/1974.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.