Terms of Service
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Democrat
-
House,
70th
(1)
(2)
Legislature
5/12/1988 - 1/10/1989
Democrat
(1)
Richard Swift, in special election 5/7/1988, sworn 5/12/1988, succeeded Cliff Johnson, resigned 1/6/1988. First session was 71st Regular.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 5/12/1988.
Oaths of Office .