Texas Legislators: Past & Present
John Willy
Terms of Service
-
House,
72nd Legislature
1/8/1991 - 1/12/1993
Republican
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Republican
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Republican
Biographical Notes and Resources
Resolutions and Journal entries
Photographs
- Photograph.
John Willy, Members of the 72nd Legislature Texas House of Representatives (CD-RW)
- Photograph.
John Willy, State Preservation Board
- Photograph.
John Willy, State Preservation Board
- Photograph.
John Willy, State Preservation Board
Committee Information
- 72nd R.S. - 1991
- 71st R.S. - 1989
- 70th R.S. - 1987
- 69th R.S. - 1985