Terms of Service
-
House,
71st Legislature
1/10/1989 - 1/8/1991
Republican
-
House,
70th Legislature
1/13/1987 - 1/10/1989
Republican
-
House,
69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Republican
-
House,
68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Republican
-
House,
67th Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Republican
-
House,
66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Republican
-
House,
65th Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/9/1979
Republican
-
House,
64th
(1)
Legislature
8/26/1976 - 1/11/1977
Republican
(1)
Brad Wright, in special election 8/14/1976, sworn 8/26/1976, succeeded Kathryn A. Bailey, resigned 7/9/1976.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.