Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Bob Bush
Full Name: Robert Grammar "Bob" Bush III
Birth date: January 15, 1936
Death date: May 14, 2002
Terms of Service
House, 69th Legislature
1/8/1985 - 1/13/1987
Democrat
House, 68th Legislature
1/11/1983 - 1/8/1985
Democrat
House, 67th Legislature
1/13/1981 - 1/11/1983
Democrat
House, 66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
House, 65th Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/9/1979
Democrat
Biographical Notes and Resources
Selected Newspaper articles
Resolutions and Journal entries
69th Legislature, 3rd C.S., HR 91.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
78th Legislature, R.S., HR 669.
Resolutions - Memorial
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Robert (Bob) Bush,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Bush,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Bob Bush,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Robert Bush,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Robert Bush,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Memorial, December 2002, p. 1017.
Texas Bar Journal
.
Bush, Robert Grammar.
Texas State Cemetery
.
United States Army.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Committee Information
69th R.S. - 1985
Financial Institutions
Financial Institutions Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Judiciary
(Chair)
68th R.S. - 1983
Judiciary
(Chair)
Judiciary Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Judiciary, Select
(Vice Chair)
State Affairs
67th R.S. - 1981
Election Contest, Special
Judicial Selection, Select
(Chair)
Judiciary
(Chair)
Judiciary Subcommittee on Budget and Oversight
Regions, Compacts, and Districts
66th R.S. - 1979
Appropriations
Business and Industry
Products Liability, Select
(Vice Chair)
65th R.S. - 1977
Drugs and Alcohol Abuse and Control, Select
(Vice Chair)
Energy Resources
Social Services
Social Services Subcommittee on Appropriative Matters
Social Services Subcommittee on Rehabilitation
(Vice Chair)
LRL Home
|
View full site