Full Name: William A. Ellett
Other surnames:
Ellette, Elliott
Birth date: 1834
Death date: Deceased, date unknown
Terms of Service
-
House,
13th
(1)
Legislature
1/14/1873 - 1/13/1874
Republican
-
House,
8th
(2)
(3)
Legislature
11/7/1859 - 2/5/1861
(1)
Republican.
Directory of the Members of the Thirteenth Legislature of the State of Texas 1873.
(2)
[In late 1860 and early 1861] legislators Micajah Lewis Armstrong, John L. Haynes, and Robert H. Taylor mailed circulars to their constituencies defending their unpopular Unionist positions. They joined other Unionist legislators and convention delegates on February 6 in issuing an address entreating Texans to reject secession." "Origins of Early Texas Republican Party Leadership," Vol. 40, No. 3, pp. 447.
Journal of Southern History .
(3)
Thomas Lewellen, sworn 3/18/1861, succeeded William A. Ellett, resigned 2/5/1861.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.