Terms of Service
-
Senate,
6th
(4)
(5)
(6)
Legislature
11/5/1855 - 11/2/1857
-
House,
4th
(1)
Legislature
11/3/1851 - 11/7/1853
(1)
"A Whig in the 1830s and 1840s and thereafter a staunch Republican, Flanagan was a close friend and supporter of Sam Houston."
Handbook of Texas Online .
(2)
"[James] Flanagan's successor, Donald Campbell, 'President of the Senate for the time being,' was elected October 27, 1870 [sic], died November 6, 1871 and was succeeded by Webster Flanagan, elected November 13, 1871."
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
[James] Flanagan presided as President of the Senate in Provisional Session and was elected U.S. Senator, vacating his state office.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
Included "[a]mong 1855 legislators that this writer has positively identified as Know Nothings." The party was active in Texas at the state level between 1855 and 1857. "An Analysis of the Texas Know Nothings,"
The Southwestern Historical Quarterly, Volume 70, Number 3, January 1967, pp. 414, 416-417, crediting Texas State Historical Association.
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .
(5)
6th Legislature, Regular Session - Roll of Senators elected since the last adjournment presented their credentials, and being qualified, took their seats, 11/5/1855, p. 2.
Senate Journal .
(6)
6th Legislature - "The Know-Nothings claimed to have won 11 of 33 seats in the Senate in 1855. Although only 5 - John Caldwell, William H. Martin, William M. Taylor, James W. Flanagan, and Elisha E. Lott - can be positively identified . . .", p. 258.
The Texas Senate: Volume I, Republic to Civil War, 1836-1861 1990.