Terms of Service
-
House,
67th
(1)
(2)
(4)
(5)
Legislature
1/13/1981 - 11/2/1981
Republican
-
House,
66th Legislature
1/9/1979 - 1/13/1981
Republican
-
House,
65th Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/9/1979
Republican
-
House,
64th Legislature
1/14/1975 - 1/11/1977
Republican
-
House,
63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Republican
-
House,
61st
(3)
Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
-
House,
60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
(1)
Proclamation, 10/29/1981, ordering a special election in House District 57-F on 12/5/1981 to serve out the unexpired term of the Honorable James Nowlin.
Governor William P. Clements .
(2)
Lamar Smith, in special election 12/5/1981, sworn 12/15/1981, succeeded James R. Nowlin, resigned 11/6/1981. Smith resigned 11/15/1982 (he served 67th 2nd and 3rd Called Sessions only).
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
Party switch: Democrat during two House terms, ran as Republican in 1970 for State Senate. "James Nowlin," 10/19/1970.
San Antonio Light .
(4)
Resignation letter to Governor Clements dated 10/27/1981, upon confirmation as U.S. District Judge, Western District of Texas, oath of office to occur on 11/6/1981; resignation from Texas House of Representatives effective 11/2/1981.
Texas House of Representatives .
(5)
Resignation and special elections information, 67th Legislature.
Texas House of Representatives, Chief Clerk's Office .