Terms of Service
(1)
Zimri Hunt, sworn 11/18/1850, succeeded William E. Crump, resigned 10/13/1850.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Branch resigned as speaker 3/16, and Crump was again elected, resigning 5/1 to be succeeded the same day by Bourland, who resigned 5/11 and was succeeded by Perkins.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(3)
Crump, elected speaker 2/16/1846, on 3/3 was granted leave of absence until 3/15, and Brown was elected speaker pro tempore. Brown resigned 3/9, the House adopted a resolution declaring the office vacant since 3/3, and Branch was elected speaker.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(4)
Democrat. Table of members of the 1st Legislature,
The Texas Democrat (Austin, Texas), 5/20/1846, p. 3, crediting Dolph Briscoe Center for American History.
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .
(5)
Roster of members of the 2nd Legislature,
The Texas Democrat (Austin, Texas), 12/15/1847, p. 2, crediting Dolph Briscoe Center for American History.
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .
(6)
Roster of members elect of the 3rd Legislature, Matthewson, R.C.,
Texas State Gazette (Austin, Texas), 9/29/1849, p. 6, crediting Dolph Briscoe Center for American History.
Portal to Texas History (University of North Texas Libraries) .