Terms of Service
(1)
Craig Estes, in special election 12/4/2001, sworn 12/10/2001, succeeded Tom Haywood, died 7/12/2001.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
78th Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 1/14/2003, SR 7, pp. 15-16. Drew 2-year term.
Senate Journal .
(3)
83rd Legislature - Drawing for Terms of Office, 1/23/2013, SR 36, pp. 81-82. Drew 2-year term.
Senate Journal .
(4)
Special Election 11/6/2001 and Special Runoff Election 12/4/2001, State Senate, District 30.
Texas Secretary of State - Historical Election Returns, 1992-2019 .
(5)
Estes oath of office date 12/10/2001.
Texas Senate, Secretary of the Senate .