Terms of Service
-
Senate,
66th & 65th Legislatures
1/11/1977 - 1/13/1981
Democrat
-
Senate,
64th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
4/3/1976 - 1/11/1977
Democrat
-
House,
64th
(1)
(2)
(3)
Legislature
1/1/1975 - 1/31/1976
Democrat
-
House,
63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Democrat
(1)
In Senate, Eugene Jones, in special election 4/3/1976, sworn in 65th Legislature, succeeded Robert A. Gammage, resigned 1/23/1976. In House, J. L. Briscoe, in special election 4/3/1976, sworn 4/13/1976, succeeded Eugene Jones, resigned 1/31/1976. Briscoe did not serve in leg session.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Special election 2/28/1976, runoff 4/3/1976.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .
(3)
Jones' Senatorial oath of office was 64th Interim (1976). First session was 65th Regular.
Texas Senate, Secretary of the Senate - Seniority and President Pro Tempore List 1967.