Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Sid Bowers
Full Name: A. Sidney "Sid" Bowers III
Terms of Service
House, 63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Republican
House, 62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Republican
Biographical Notes and Resources
Photographs
Photograph.
Sid Bowers,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Sid Bowers,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Delegate to the Texas Constitutional Convention, 1974.
Record of Proceedings, Texas Constitutional Convention: Official Journals, January 8 - July 30, 1974
1975.
Photograph, "Where Are They Now? The Dirty Thirty," September 2001, p. 52.
Texas Monthly
.
Committee Information
63rd R.S. - 1973
Business and Industry
Environmental Affairs
Environmental Affairs Subcommittee on State Parks
Labor
62nd R.S. - 1971
Aeronautics
History of Members of the Texas Legislature
Juvenile Crime and Deliquency
Labor
No-Fault Automobile Insurance and Competitive Automobile Insurance Rate-Making
Public Health
Resolutions and Interim Activities
LRL Home
|
View full site