Terms of Service
-
House,
65th
(1)
(3)
(4)
Legislature
1/11/1977 - 1/3/1979
Democrat
Speaker Pro Tem, 2/22/1978.
-
House,
64th Legislature
1/14/1975 - 1/11/1977
Democrat
-
House,
63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Democrat
-
House,
62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
-
House,
61st Legislature
1/14/1969 - 1/12/1971
Democrat
-
House,
60th Legislature
1/10/1967 - 1/14/1969
Democrat
-
House,
59th Legislature
1/12/1965 - 1/10/1967
Democrat
-
House,
58th
(2)
Legislature
1/8/1963 - 1/12/1965
Democrat
-
House,
57th Legislature
1/10/1961 - 1/8/1963
Democrat
(1)
Gerald Geistweidt, in special election 2/3/1979, sworn 2/9/1979, succeeded James E. Nugent, resigned 1/3/1979.
Members of the Texas Congress 1836-1845; Members of the Texas Legislature 1846-2004 2005.
(2)
Sworn 11/23/1962.
Oaths of Office .
(3)
Nugent resignation letter dated 12/15/1978, effective 1/3/1979. Declined election and will not qualify as a member of the House of Representatives of the 66th Legislature.
Texas House of Representatives .
(4)
Special election 1/6/1979, runoff 2/3/1979.
Texas Secretary of State - Election Dates Including Special Elections, 1966-2001 .