Legislative Reference Library
Texas Legislators: Past & Present
Charles Tupper, Jr.
Full Name: Charles Frederick "Charlie" Tupper, Jr.
Terms of Service
House, 63rd Legislature
1/9/1973 - 1/14/1975
Democrat
House, 62nd Legislature
1/12/1971 - 1/9/1973
Democrat
Biographical Notes and Resources
Resolutions and Journal entries
63rd Legislature, R.S., HSR 37.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
62nd Legislature, 4th C.S., HSR 29.
Resolutions - Congratulatory and Honorary
.
Photographs
Photograph.
Representatives John R. Bigham, Carl Parker, and Charles Tupper on the House Floor.,
House Photography
Photograph.
Charles Tupper, Jr.,
State Preservation Board
Photograph.
Charles Tupper, Jr.,
State Preservation Board
Other Resources
Oral history interview available in
Oral History Collection, University of North Texas
.
Delegate to the Texas Constitutional Convention, 1974.
Record of Proceedings, Texas Constitutional Convention: Official Journals, January 8 - July 30, 1974
1975.
Author of Texas' Right Turn on Red bill,
HB 106
, 63rd Legislature, R.S., 1973; and Texas' Multi-year License Plates bill,
HB 177
, 63rd Legislature, R.S., 1973.
Representative Charlie Tupper
.
Tupper, Charles Frederick.
Texas State Cemetery
.
Committee Information
63rd R.S. - 1973
Intergovernmental Affairs
Labor
(Vice Chair)
Revenue and Taxation
Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee on Exemptions
62nd 3rd C.S. - 1972
Revenue and Taxation
62nd R.S. - 1971
Commerce and Manufacturing
County Government
Governmental Affairs and Efficiency
Judiciary
Public Education Financing
Public Health
Revenue and Taxation, Interim
Urban Affairs
LRL Home
|
View full site